Thứ Tự |
Hình |
Tên |
Nhiệm Kỳ |
Nơi Sinh |
265 |
|
Benedict XVI |
19 April 2005 – present |
Marktl am Inn, Bavaria, Germany |
264 |
|
John Paul II |
16 October 1978 – 2 April 2005 (26 năm) |
Wadowice, Poland |
263 |
|
John Paul I |
26 August 1978 – 28 September 1978 (33 ngày) |
Forno di Canale (now Canale d’Agordo), Veneto, Italy |
262 |
|
Paul VI |
21 June 1963 – 6 August 1978 (15 năm) |
Concesio, Brescia, Italy |
261 |
|
John XXIII, O.F.S. |
28 October 1958 – 3 June 1963 (4 năm) |
Sotto il Monte, Bergamo, Italy |
260 |
|
Pius XII, O.F.S. |
2 March 1939 – 9 October 1958 (19 năm) |
Rome, Italy |
259 |
|
Pius XI, O.F.S. |
6 February 1922 – 10 February 1939 (17 năm) |
Desio, Lombardy-Venetia, Austrian Empire |
258 |
|
Benedict XV, O.F.S. |
3 September 1914 – 22 January 1922 (7 năm) |
Genoa, Kingdom of Sardinia |
257 |
|
Pius X, O.F.S. |
4 August 1903 – 20 August 1914 (11 năm) |
Riese, Lombardy-Venetia, Austrian Empire |
256 |
|
Leo XIII, O.F.S. |
20 February 1878 – 20 July 1903 (25 năm) |
Carpineto Romano, Rome – Italy |
|
|
|
|
|
Thứ Tự |
Hình |
Tên |
Nhiệm Kỳ |
Nơi Sinh |
255 |
|
Pius IX, O.F.S. |
16 June 1846 – 7 February 1878 (31 năm) |
Senigallia, Marche, Papal States |
254 |
|
Gregory XVI, O.S.B. Cam. |
2 February 1831 – 1 June 1846 (15 năm) |
Belluno, Republic of Venice |
253 |
|
Pius VIII |
31 March 1829 – 1 December 1830 (1 năm) |
Cingoli, Marche, Papal States |
252 |
|
Leo XII |
28 September 1823 – 10 February 1829 (5 năm) |
Genga or Spoleto, Papal States |
251 |
|
Pius VII, O.S.B. |
14 March 1800 – 20 August 1823 (23 năm) |
Cesena, Papal States |
250 |
|
Pius VI |
15 February 1775 – 29 August 1799 (24 năm) |
Cesena, Papal States |
249 |
|
Clement XIV, O.F.M. Conv. |
19 May 1769 – 22 September 1774 (5 năm) |
Sant’ Arcangelo di Romagna, Papal States |
248 |
|
Clement XIII |
6 July 1758 – 2 February 1769 (10 năm) |
Venice, Republic of Venice |
247 |
|
Benedict XIV |
17 August 1740 – 3 May 1758 (17 năm) |
Bologna, Papal States |
246 |
|
Clement XII |
12 July 1730 – 6 February 1740 (9 năm) |
Florence, Grand Duchy of Tuscany |
|
|
|
|
|
Thứ Tự |
Hình |
Tên |
Nhiệm Kỳ |
Nơi Sinh |
245 |
|
Benedict XIII, O.P. |
29 May 1724 – 21 February 1730 (5 năm) |
Gravina in Puglia, Kingdom of Naples |
244 |
|
Innocent XIII |
8 May 1721 – 7 March 1724 (2 năm) |
Poli, Lazio, Papal States |
243 |
|
Clement XI |
23 November 1700 – 19 March 1721 (20 năm) |
Urbino, Marche, Papal States |
242 |
|
Innocent XII |
12 July 1691 – 27 September 1700 (9 năm) |
Spinazzola, Kingdom of Naples |
241 |
|
Alexander VIII |
6 October 1689 – 1 February 1691 (1 năm) |
Venice, Republic of Venice |
240 |
|
Innocent XI |
(12 năm) |
Como, Duchy of Milan |
239 |
|
Clement X |
29 April 1670 – 22 July 1676 (6 năm) |
Rome, Papal States |
238 |
|
Clement IX |
20 June 1667 – 9 December 1669 (2 năm) |
Pistoia, Grand Duchy of Tuscany |
237 |
|
Alexander VII |
7 April 1655 – 22 May 1667 (12 năm) |
Siena, Grand Duchy of Tuscany |
236 |
|
Innocent X |
15 September 1644 – 7 January 1655 (10 năm) |
Rome, Papal States |
|
|
|
|
|
Thứ Tự |
Hình |
Tên |
Nhiệm Kỳ |
Nơi Sinh |
235 |
|
Urban VIII |
6 August 1623 – 29 July 1644 (20 năm) |
Florence, Duchy of Florence |
234 |
|
Gregory XV |
9 February 1621 – 8 July 1623 (2 năm) |
Bologna, Papal States |
233 |
|
Paul V |
16 May 1605 – 28 January 1621 (15 năm) |
Rome, Papal States |
232 |
|
Leo XI |
1 April 1605 – 27 April 1605 (27 ngày) |
Florence, Duchy of Florence |
231 |
|
Clement VIII |
30 January 1592 – 3 March 1605 (13 năm) |
Fano, Marche, Papal States |
230 |
|
Innocent IX |
29 October 1591 – 30 December 1591 (63 ngày) |
Bologna, Papal States |
229 |
|
Gregory XIV |
5 December 1590 – 15/16 October 1591 (315/316 ngày) |
Somma Lombardo, Duchy of Milan |
228 |
|
Urban VII |
15 September 1590 – 27 September 1590 (13 ngày) |
Rome, Papal States |
227 |
|
Sixtus V, O.F.M. Conv. |
24 April 1585 – 27 August 1590 (5 năm) |
Grottammare, Marche, Papal States |
226 |
|
Gregory XIII |
13 May 1572 – 10 April 1585 (12 năm) |
Bologna, Papal States |
|
|
|
|
|
Thứ Tự |
Hình |
Tên |
Nhiệm Kỳ |
Nơi Sinh |
225 |
|
Saint Pius V, O.P. |
7 January 1566 – 1 May 1572 (6 năm) |
Bosco, Duchy of Milan |
224 |
|
Pius IV |
26 December 1559 – 9 December 1565 (5 năm) |
Milan, Duchy of Milan |
223 |
|
Paul IV |
23 May 1555 – 18 August 1559 (4 năm) |
Capriglia Irpina, Campania, Kingdom of Naples |
222 |
|
|
9 April 1555 – 30 April or 1 May 1555 (22/23 ngày) |
Montefano, Marche, Papal States |
221 |
|
Julius III |
7 February 1550 – 29 March 1555 (5 năm) |
Rome, Papal States |
220 |
|
Paul III |
13 October 1534 – 10 November 1549 (15 năm) |
Canino, Lazio, Papal States |
219 |
|
Clement VII |
26 November 1523 – 25 September 1534 (11 năm) |
Florence, Republic of Florence |
218 |
|
Adrian VI |
9 January 1522 – 14 September 1523 (1 năm) |
Utrecht, Bishopric of Utrecht, Holy Roman Empire |
217 |
|
Leo X |
9 March 1513 – 1 December 1521 (8 năm) |
Florence, Republic of Florence |
216 |
|
Julius II |
31 October 1503 – 21 February 1513 (9 năm) |
Albisola, Republic of Genoa |
|
|
|
|
|
Thứ Tự |
Hình |
Tên |
Nhiệm Kỳ |
Nơi Sinh |
215 |
|
Pius III |
22 September 1503 – 18 October 1503 (27 ngày) |
Siena, Republic of Siena |
214 |
|
Alexander VI |
11 August 1492 – 18 August 1503 (11 năm) |
Xàtiva, Kingdom of Valencia, Crown of Aragon |
213 |
|
Innocent VIII |
29 August 1484 – 25 July 1492 (7 năm) |
Genoa, Republic of Genoa |
212 |
|
Sixtus IV, O.F.M. |
9 August 1471 – 12 August 1484 (13 năm) |
Celle Ligure, Republic of Genoa |
211 |
|
Paul II |
30 August 1464 – 26 July 1471 (6 năm) |
Venice, Republic of Venice |
210 |
|
Pius II |
19 August 1458 – 15 August 1464 (5 năm) |
Corsignano, Republic of Siena |
209 |
|
Callixtus III |
8 April 1455 – 6 August 1458 (3 năm) |
Xàtiva, Kingdom of Valencia, Crown of Aragon |
208 |
|
Nicholas V |
6 March 1447 – 24 March 1455 (8 năm) |
Sarzana, Republic of Genoa |
207 |
|
Eugene IV, O.S.A. |
3 March 1431 – 23 February 1447 (15 năm) |
Venice, Republic of Venice |
206 |
|
Martin V |
11 November 1417 – 20 February 1431 (13 năm) |
Genazzano, Papal States |
|
|
|
|
|
Thứ Tự |
Hình |
Tên |
Nhiệm Kỳ |
Nơi Sinh |
2 năm không chọn được giáo hoàng. |
4 July 1415 – 11 November 1417 (2 năm) |
205 |
|
Gregory XII |
30 November 1406 – 4 July 1415 (8 năm) |
Venice, Republic of Venice |
204 |
|
Innocent VII |
17 October 1404 – 6 November 1406 (2 năm) |
Sulmona, Kingdom of Naples |
203 |
|
Boniface IX |
2 November 1389 – 1 October 1404 (14 năm) |
Naples, Kingdom of Naples |
202 |
|
Urban VI |
8 April 1378 – 15 October 1389 (11 năm) |
Naples, Kingdom of Naples |
201 |
|
Gregory XI |
30 December 1370 – 26 March 1378 (7 năm) |
Maumont, Limousin, France |
200 |
|
Urban V |
28 September 1362 – 19 December 1370 (8 năm) |
Grizac, Languedoc, France |
199 |
|
Innocent VI |
18 December 1352 – 12 September 1362 ( năm) |
Les Monts, Limousin, France |
198 |
|
Clement VI |
7 May 1342 – 6 December 1352 (10 năm) |
Maumont, Limousin, France |
197 |
|
Benedict XII |
20 December 1334 – 25 April 1342 (7 năm) |
Saverdun, County of Foix, France |
196 |
|
John XXII |
7 August 1316 – 4 December 1334 (18 năm) |
Cahors, Quercy, France |
|
|
|
|
|
Thứ Tự |
Hình |
Tên |
Nhiệm Kỳ |
Nơi Sinh |
2 năm không chọn được giáo hoàng. |
20 April 1314 – 7 August 1316 (2 năm) |
195 |
|
Clement V |
5 June 1305 – 20 April 1314 (8 năm) |
Villandraut, Gascony, France |
194 |
|
Benedict XI |
22 October 1303 – 7 July 1304 (260 ngày) |
Treviso, Italy, Holy Roman Empire |
193 |
|
Boniface VIII |
24 December 1294 – 11 October 1303 (8 năm) |
Anagni, Papal States, Holy Roman Empire |
192 |
|
Celestine V |
5 July 1294 – 13 December 1294 (223 ngày) |
Sant’ Angelo Limosano, Kingdom of Sicily |
2 năm không chọn được giáo hoàng. |
4 April 1292 – 5 July 1294 (2 năm) |
191 |
|
Nicholas IV |
22 February 1288 – 4 April 1292 (4 năm) |
Lisciano, Papal States, Holy Roman Empire |
190 |
|
Honorius IV |
2 April 1285 – 3 April 1287 (2 năm) |
Rome, Papal States, Holy Roman Empire |
189 |
|
Martin IV |
22 February 1281 – 28 March 1285 (4 năm) |
Meinpicien, Touraine, France |
188 |
|
Nicholas III |
25 November 1277 – 22 August 1280 (2 năm) |
Rome, Papal States, Holy Roman Empire |
187 |
|
John XXI |
8 September 1276 – 20 May 1277 |
Lisbon, Portugal |
186 |
|
Adrian V |
11 July 1276 – 18 August 1276 (39 ngày) |
Genoa, Republic of Genoa, Holy Roman Empire |
|
|
|
|
|
Thứ Tự |
Hình |
Tên |
Nhiệm Kỳ |
Nơi Sinh |
185 |
|
Innocent V |
21 January 1276 – 22 June 1276 |
County of Savoy, Holy Roman Empire |
184 |
|
Gregory X |
1 September 1271 – 10 January 1276 (4 năm) |
Piacenza, Italy, Holy Roman Empire |
2 năm không chọn được giáo hoàng. |
29 November 1268 – 1 September 1271 (2 năm) |
183 |
|
Clement IV |
5 February 1265 – 29 November 1268 (3 năm) |
Saint-Gilles, Languedoc, France |
182 |
|
Urban IV |
29 August 1261 – 2 October 1264 (3 năm) |
Troyes, County of Champagne, France |
181 |
|
Alexander IV |
12 December 1254 – 25 May 1261 (6 năm) |
Jenne, Papal States, Holy Roman Empire |
180 |
|
Innocent IV |
25 June 1243 – 7 December 1254 (11 năm) |
Genoa, Republic of Genoa, Holy Roman Empire |
179 |
|
Celestine IV |
25 October 1241 – 10 November 1241 (17 ngày) |
Milan, Italy, Holy Roman Empire |
178 |
|
Gregory IX |
19 March 1227 – 22 August 1241 (14 năm) |
Anagni, Papal States, Holy Roman Empire |
177 |
|
Honorius III |
18 July 1216 – 18 March 1227 (10 năm) |
Rome, Papal States, Holy Roman Empire |
176 |
|
Innocent III |
8 January 1198 – 16 July 1216 |
Gavignano, Papal States, Holy Roman Empire |
|
|
|
|
|
Thứ Tự |
Hình |
Tên |
Nhiệm Kỳ |
Nơi Sinh |
175 |
|
Celestine III |
21 March 1191 – 8 January 1198 |
Rome, Papal States, Holy Roman Empire |
174 |
|
Clement III |
19 December 1187 – 20 March 1191 |
Rome, Papal States, Holy Roman Empire |
173 |
|
Gregory VIII |
21 October 1187 – 17 December 1187 |
Benevento, Papal States, Holy Roman Empire |
172 |
|
Urban III |
25 November 1185 – 19 October 1187 |
Cuggiono, Italy, Holy Roman Empire |
171 |
|
Lucius III |
1 September 1181 – 25 November 1185 |
Lucca, Italy, Holy Roman Empire |
170 |
|
Alexander III |
7 September 1159 – 30 August 1181 |
Siena, Italy, Holy Roman Empire |
169 |
|
Adrian IV |
4 December 1154 – 1 September 1159 |
Abbots Langley, Hertfordshire, Kingdom of England |
168 |
|
Anastasius IV |
8 July 1153 – 3 December 1154 |
Rome, Papal States, Holy Roman Empire |
167 |
|
Eugene III |
15 February 1145 – 8 July 1153 |
Pisa, Republic of Pisa, Holy Roman Empire |
166 |
|
Lucius II |
12 March 1144 – 15 February 1145 |
Bologna, Papal States, Holy Roman Empire |
|
|
|
|
|
Thứ Tự |
Hình |
Tên |
Nhiệm Kỳ |
Nơi Sinh |
165 |
|
Celestine II |
26 September 1143 – 8 March 1144 |
Città di Castello, Papal States, Holy Roman Empire |
164 |
|
Innocent II |
14 February 1130 – 24 September 1143 |
Rome, Papal States, Holy Roman Empire |
163 |
|
Honorius II |
15 December 1124 – 13 February 1130 |
Fiagnano, Papal States, Holy Roman Empire |
162 |
|
Callixtus II |
2 February 1119 – 13 December 1124 |
Quingey, County of Burgundy, Holy Roman Empire |
161 |
|
Gelasius II |
24 January 1118 – 28 January 1119 |
Gaeta, Principality of Capua |
160 |
|
Paschal II |
13 August 1099 – 21 January 1118 |
Bleda, Papal States, Holy Roman Empire |
159 |
|
Urban II |
12 March 1088 – 29 July 1099 |
Lagery, County of Champagne, France |
158 |
|
Victor III |
24 May 1086 – 16 September 1087 |
Benevento, Duchy of Benevento |
157 |
|
Gregory VII |
22 April 1073 – 25 May 1085 |
Sovana, Italy, Holy Roman Empire |
156 |
|
Alexander II |
30 September 1061 – 21 April 1073 |
Milan, Italy, Holy Roman Empire |
|
|
|
|
|
Thứ Tự |
Hình |
Tên |
Nhiệm Kỳ |
Nơi Sinh |
155 |
|
Nicholas II |
6 December 1058 – 27 July 1061 |
Château de Chevron, Kingdom of Arles |
154 |
|
Stephen IX |
2 August 1057 – 29 March 1058 |
Duchy of Lorraine, Holy Roman Empire |
153 |
|
Victor II |
13 April 1055 – 28 July 1057 |
Kingdom of Germany, Holy Roman Empire |
152 |
|
Leo IX |
12 February 1049 – 19 April 1054 |
Eguisheim, Swabia, Holy Roman Empire |
151 |
|
Damasus II |
17 July 1048 – 9 August 1048 |
Pildenau, Duchy of Bavaria, Holy Roman Empire |
150 |
|
Benedict IX |
08 November 1047 – 17 July 1048 |
Rome, Papal States, Holy Roman Empire |
149 |
|
Clement II |
24 December 1046 – 9 October 1047 |
Hornburg, Duchy of Saxony, Holy Roman Empire |
148 |
|
Gregory VI |
05 May 1045 – 20 December 1046 |
Rome, Papal States, Holy Roman Empire |
147 |
|
Benedict IX |
10 April 1045 – 1 May 1045 |
Rome, Papal States, Holy Roman Empire |
146 |
|
Sylvester III |
20 January 1045 – 10 February 1045 |
Rome, Papal States, Holy Roman Empire |
|
|
|
|
|
Thứ Tự |
Hình |
Tên |
Nhiệm Kỳ |
Nơi Sinh |
145 |
|
Benedict IX |
1032 – 1044 |
Rome, Papal States, Holy Roman Empire |
144 |
|
John XIX |
April/May 1024 – 20 October 1032/td>
Rome, Papal States, Holy Roman Empire |
143 |
|
Benedict VIII |
18 May 1012 – 9 April 1024 |
Rome, Papal States, Holy Roman Empire |
142 |
|
Sergius IV |
31 July 1009 – 12 May 1012 |
Rome, Papal States, Holy Roman Empire |
141 |
|
John XVIII/td>
25 December 1003 – July 1009Rapagnano, Papal States |
140 |
|
John XVII |
June 1003 – December 1003 |
Rome, Papal States |
139 |
|
Sylvester II |
2 April 999 – 12 May 1003 |
Auvergne region of France |
138 |
|
Gregory V |
3 May 996 – 18 February 999 |
Germany, Holy Roman Empire |
137 |
|
John XV |
August 985 – March 996 |
Rome |
136 |
|
John XIV |
December 983 – 20 August 984 |
Pavia |
|
|
|
|
|
Thứ Tự |
Hình |
Tên |
Nhiệm Kỳ |
Nơi Sinh |
135 |
|
Benedict VII |
October 974 – 10 July 983 |
Rome |
134 |
|
Benedict VI |
19 January 973 – June 974 |
Rome, Papal States |
133 |
|
John XIII |
1 October 965 – 6 September 972 |
Rome |
132 |
|
Leo VIII |
July 964 – 1 March 965 |
Rome |
131 |
|
Benedict V |
22 May 964 – 23 June 964 |
Rome |
130 |
|
John XII |
16 December 955 – 14 May 964 |
Rome |
129 |
|
Agapetus II |
10 May 946 – December 955 |
Rome |
128 |
|
Marinus II |
30 October 942 – May 946 |
Rome |
127 |
|
Stephen VIII |
14 July 939 – October 942 |
Germany |
126 |
|
Leo VII |
3 January 936 – 13 July 939 |
Rome |
|
|
|
|
|
Thứ Tự |
Hình |
Tên |
Nhiệm Kỳ |
Nơi Sinh |
125 |
|
John XI |
February/March 931 – December 935 |
Rome |
124 |
|
Stephen VII |
December 928 – February 931 |
Rome |
123 |
|
Leo VI |
May 928 – December 928 |
Rome |
122 |
|
John X |
March 914 – May 928 |
Romagna, Italy |
121 |
|
Lando |
July/August 913 – February/March 914 |
Sabina, Italy |
120 |
|
Anastasius III |
April 911 – June 913 |
Rome |
119 |
|
Sergius III |
29 January 904 – 14 April 911 |
Rome |
118 |
|
Leo V |
July 903 – September 903 |
Ardea |
117 |
|
Benedict IV |
900 – 903 |
Rome |
116 |
|
John IX |
January 898 – January 900 |
Tivoli, Italy |
|
|
|
|
|
Thứ Tự |
Hình |
Tên |
Nhiệm Kỳ |
Nơi Sinh |
115 |
|
Theodore II |
December 897 |
Rome |
114 |
|
Romanus |
August 897 – November 897 |
Gallese, Rome |
113 |
|
Stephen VI |
22 May 896 – August 897 |
Roma |
112 |
|
Boniface VI |
4 April 896 – 19 April 896 |
Roma |
111 |
|
Formosus |
19 September 891 – 4 April 896 |
Ostia |
110 |
|
Stephen V |
885 – 14 September 891 |
Rome |
109 |
|
Adrian III |
17 May 884 – c.September 885 |
Rome |
108 |
|
Marinus I |
16 December 882 – 15 May 884 |
Gallese, Rome |
107 |
|
John VIII |
14 December 872 – 16 December 882 |
Rome |
106 |
|
Adrian II |
14 December 867 – 14 December 872 |
Rome |
|
|
|
|
|
Thứ Tự |
Hình |
Tên |
Nhiệm Kỳ |
Nơi Sinh |
105 |
|
Nicholas I |
24 April 858 – 13 November 867 |
Rome |
104 |
|
Benedict III |
855 – 7 April 858 |
Rome |
103 |
|
Leo IV |
January 847 – 17 July 855 |
Rome |
102 |
|
Sergius II |
January 844 – 7 January 847 |
Rome |
101 |
|
Gregory IV |
827 – January 844 |
Rome |
100 |
|
Valentine |
August 827 – September 827 |
Rome |
99 |
|
Eugene II |
8 May 824 – August 827 |
Rome |
98 |
|
Paschal I |
25 January 817 – 11 February 824 |
Rome |
97 |
|
Stephen IV |
12 June 816 – 24 January 817 |
Rome |
96 |
|
Leo III |
26 December 795 – 12 June 816 |
Rome |
|
|
|
|
|
Thứ Tự |
Hình |
Tên |
Nhiệm Kỳ |
Nơi Sinh |
95 |
|
Adrian I |
1 February 772 – 26 December 795 |
Rome |
94 |
|
Stephen III |
1/7 August 767 – 24 January 772 |
Sicily |
93 |
|
Paul I |
29 May 757 – 28 June 767 |
Rome |
92 |
|
Stephen II |
26 March 752 – 26 April 757 |
Rome |
91 |
|
Zachary |
3 December 741 – 14/22 March 752 |
Greece |
90 |
|
Gregory III |
18 March 731 – 28 November 741 |
Syria |
89 |
|
Gregory II |
19 May 715 – 11 February 731 |
Rome |
88 |
|
Constantine |
25 March 708 – 9 April 715 |
Syria |
87 |
|
Sisinnius |
15 January 708 – 4 February 708 |
Syria |
86 |
|
John VII |
1 March 705 – 18 October 707 |
Greece |
|
|
|
|
|
Thứ Tự |
Hình |
Tên |
Nhiệm Kỳ |
Nơi Sinh |
85 |
|
John VI |
30 October 701 – 11 January 705 |
Greece |
84 |
|
Sergius I |
15 December 687 – 8 September 701 |
Sicily |
83 |
|
Conon |
21 October 686 – 22 September 687 |
Thrace, Hy Lạp |
82 |
|
John V |
12 July 685 – 2 August 686 |
Syria |
81 |
|
Benedict II |
683/26 June 684 – 8 May 685 |
Rome, Byzantine Empire |
80 |
|
Leo II |
December 681 – 3 July 683 |
Sicily |
79 |
|
Agatho |
27 June 678 – 10 January 681 |
Sicily |
78 |
|
Donus |
2 November 676 – 11 April 678 |
Rome, Byzantine Empire |
77 |
|
Adeodatus II |
11 April 672 – 17 June 676 |
Rome, Byzantine Empire |
76 |
|
Vitalian |
30 July 657 – 27 January 672 |
Segni, Byzantine Empire |
|
|
|
|
|
Thứ Tự |
Hình |
Tên |
Nhiệm Kỳ |
Nơi Sinh |
75 |
|
Eugene I |
10 August 654 – 2 June 657 |
Rome |
74 |
|
Martin I |
Near Todi, Umbria, Byzantine Empire |
July 649 – 16 September 655 |
73 |
|
Theodore I |
24 November 642 – 14 May 649 |
Palestine |
72 |
|
John IV |
24 December 640 – 12 October 642 |
Zadar, Dalmatia, now Croatia |
71 |
|
Severinus |
October 638 – 2 August 640 |
Rome |
70 |
|
Honorius I |
27 October 625 – 12 October 638 |
Campania, Byzantine Empire |
69 |
|
Boniface V |
23 December 619 – 25 October 625 |
Naples |
68 |
|
Adeodatus I |
19 October 615 – 8 November 618 |
Rome |
67 |
|
Boniface IV |
25 August 608 – 8 May 615 |
Marsi |
66 |
|
Boniface III |
19 February 607 – 12 November 607 |
Rome |
|
|
|
|
|
Thứ Tự |
Hình |
Tên |
Nhiệm Kỳ |
Nơi Sinh |
65 |
|
Sabinian |
13 September 604 – 22 February 606 |
Blera |
64 |
|
Gregory I |
3 September 590 – 12 March 604 |
Rome |
63 |
|
Pelagius II |
26 November 579 – 7 February 590 |
Rome |
62 |
|
Benedict I |
2 June 575 – 30 July 579 |
Rome |
61 |
|
John III |
17 July 561 – 13 July 574 |
Rome, Eastern Roman Empire |
60 |
|
Pelagius I |
16 April 556 – 4 March 561 |
Rome |
59 |
|
Vigilius |
29 March 537 – 7 June 555 |
Rome |
58 |
|
Silverius |
1 June 536 – 11 November 537 |
Frosinone |
57 |
|
Agapetus I |
13 May 535 – 22 April 536 |
Rome |
56 |
|
John II |
2 January 533 – 8 May 535 |
Rome |
|
|
|
|
|
Thứ Tự |
Hình |
Tên |
Nhiệm Kỳ |
Nơi Sinh |
55 |
|
Boniface II |
22 September 530 – 17 October 532 |
Rome |
54 |
|
Felix IV |
13 July 526 – 22 September 530/td>
Samnium |
53 |
|
John I |
13 August 523 – 18 May 526 |
Tuscany |
52 |
|
Hormisdas |
0 July 514 – 19 July 523 |
Frosinone, Southern Latium, Italy |
51 |
|
Symmachus |
22 November 498 – 19 July 514 |
Sardinia |
50 |
|
Anastasius II |
24 November 496 – 19 November 498 |
Rome |
49 |
|
Gelasius I |
1 March 492 – 21 November 496 |
Africa |
48 |
|
Felix III |
13 March 483 – 1 March 492 |
Rome |
47 |
|
Simplicius |
3 March 468 – 10 March 483 |
Tivoli, Italy |
46 |
|
Hilarius |
19 November 461 – 29 February 468 |
Sardinia, Western Roman Empire |
|
|
|
|
|
Thứ Tự |
Hình |
Tên |
Nhiệm Kỳ |
Nơi Sinh |
45 |
|
Leo I |
29 September 440 – 10 November 461 |
Rome |
44 |
|
Sixtus III |
31 July 432 – March/August 440 |
Rome |
43 |
|
Celestine I |
10 September 422 – 27 July 432 |
Rome, Western Roman Empire |
42 |
|
Boniface I |
28/29 December 418 – 4 September 422 |
Roma |
41 |
|
Zosimus |
18 March 417 – 26 December 418 |
|
40 |
|
Innocent I |
22 December 401 – 12 March 417 |
Roma |
39 |
|
Anastasius I |
27 November 399 – 19 December 401 |
Roma |
38 |
|
Siricius |
11 December 384 – 26 November 399 |
Rome |
37 |
|
Damasus I |
1 October 366 – 11 December 384 |
Idanha-a-Velha, Portugal |
36 |
|
Liberius |
17 May 352 – 24 September 366 |
Roma |
|
|
|
|
|
Thứ Tự |
Hình |
Tên |
Nhiệm Kỳ |
Nơi Sinh |
35 |
|
Julius I |
6 February 337 – 12 April 352 |
Rome |
34 |
|
Mark |
18 January 336 – 7 October 336 |
Rome |
33 |
|
Sylvester I |
31 January 314 – 31 December 335 |
Sant’Angelo a Scala, Avellino |
32 |
|
Miltiades |
2 July 311 – 11 January 314/td>
Africa |
31 |
|
Eusebius |
c.309 – c.310 |
Cassano |
30 |
|
Marcellus I |
308 – 309 |
Rome |
29 |
|
Marcellinus |
30 June 296 – 1 April 304 |
Rome |
28 |
|
Caius |
17 December 283 – 22 April 296 |
|
27 |
|
Eutychian |
4 January 275 – 7 December 283 |
|
26 |
|
Felix I |
5 January 269 – 30 December 274 |
Rome |
|
|
|
|
|
Thứ Tự |
Hình |
Tên |
Nhiệm Kỳ |
Nơi Sinh |
25 |
|
Dionysius |
22 July 259 – 26 December 268 |
Greece |
24 |
|
Sixtus II |
30/31 August 257 – 6 August 258 |
Greece |
23 |
|
Stephen I |
12 May 254 – 2 August 257 |
Rome |
22 |
|
Lucius I |
25 June 253 – 5 March 254 |
Rome |
21 |
|
Cornelius |
6/11 March 251 – June 253 |
Rome |
20 |
|
Fabian |
10 January 236 – 20 January 250 |
Rome |
19 |
|
Anterus |
21 November 235 – 3 January 236 |
Greece |
18 |
|
Pontian |
21 July 230 – 28 September 235 |
Rome |
17 |
|
Urban I |
222/223 – 230 |
Rome |
16 |
|
Callixtus I |
c.217 – 222/223 |
Rome |
|
|
|
|
|
Thứ Tự |
Hình |
Tên |
Nhiệm Kỳ |
Nơi Sinh |
15 |
|
Zephyrinus |
199 – 217 |
Rome |
14 |
|
Victor I |
189 – 198/199 |
Northern Africa |
13 |
|
Eleuterus |
174/175 – 189 |
Nicopoli, Epyrus |
12 |
|
Soter |
c.166 – 174/175 |
Fondi, Latium, Italy |
11 |
|
Anicetus |
155 – 166 |
Emesa, Syria |
10 |
|
Pius I |
140/142 – 155 |
Aquileia, Friuli, Italy |
9 |
|
Hyginus |
136/138 – 140/142 |
Greece |
8 |
|
Telesphorus |
125 – 136/138 |
Greece |
7 |
|
Sixtus I |
115/116 – 125 |
Rome or Greece |
6 |
|
Alexander I |
105/107 – 115/116 |
Rome |
|
|
|
|
|
Thứ Tự |
Hình |
Tên |
Nhiệm Kỳ |
Nơi Sinh |
5 |
|
Evaristus |
97/99 – 105/107 |
Bethlehem, Palestine |
4 |
|
Clement I |
88/92 – 97/101 |
Rome |
3 |
|
Anacletus |
76/79(?) – 88 |
|
2 |
|
Linus |
64/67(?) – 76/79(?) |
Tuscia (Northern Latium) |
1 |
|
St. Peter |
30 – 64/67 |
Bethsaida, Galilea |